Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-D beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County to issue a Class B-D license for use by a certain restaurant; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; requiring the license holder to submit a certain Food Alcohol Ratio Report to the Board once every licensing cycle; providing an annual licensing fee of $700; prohibiting the issuance of more than two Class B-D licenses in a single year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843199/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Transfer and Auction of Licenses
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {843199/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Text - Chapter - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page