Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Electric Affordability Program - Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Davis
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to study and make recommendations about the advisability of establishing an opt-in electric affordability program for residential and small business customers of specified electric companies with specified characteristics and the advisability of allowing specified electric cooperatives to participate in the program; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations on or before December 31, 2016, to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1075
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-22)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (116-22) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/08/2016 4/09/2016 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable 67
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page