Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2022, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals to serve as navigators under the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0846
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0938 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (101-32)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
House 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/24/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
House 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (101-32) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 2/17/2021 Referred Finance 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 453
Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:07 PM
Click to return on the top page