Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Update Report

As of: 9/20/2021 10:11:17 AM
Monday, September 20, 2021
Monday, September 20, 2021
Other
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Change made: September 20, 2021 10:05 AM - HEARING ADDED
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families - Other
October 6, 2021 1:00 PM
Zoom / YouTube
Briefings on long-term care issues affecting families.

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Change made: September 20, 2021 9:13 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 12, 2021 6:00 PM to October 12, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 9:21 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 18, 2021 6:00 PM to October 18, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 9:28 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
October 28, 2021 6:00 PM to October 28, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Change made: September 20, 2021 9:33 AM - HEARING ADDED
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission - Other
November 3, 2021 6:00 PM to November 3, 2021 8:00 PM
Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Legislative Redistricting

Click to return on the top page