Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Designation as Community of Innovation
Sponsored by
Delegates Wolek, Solomon, Acevero, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Cullison, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Kaiser, Kaufman, Korman, Lopez, Love, Mireku-North, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Shetty, Spiegel, Stewart, Vogel, Wilkins, Wims, Wu, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating the Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center as the State's Regional Higher Education Community of Innovation; and altering the purposes of the Universities at Shady Grove to include serving a diverse citizenry in an innovative manner to meet the educational needs of the region and fostering individual academic success leading to career success which positively impacts the economy of the entire region.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0864
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Universities at Shady Grove Regional Higher Education Center – Designation as Community of Innovation
House 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:16 PM
Click to return on the top page