Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Allen, Healey, Lehman, J. Long, Love, Ruth, Terrasa, and Ziegler
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program to create a system of supplemental guide signs to direct motorists to eligible individual attractions by directing the motorists first to groups of attractions; requiring the State Highway Administration and the Department of Commerce to develop standards and procedures for determining the eligibility of an attraction for a sign; requiring the Administration to notify certain committees of the General Assembly at least 30 days before amending the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {883025/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Highways – Tourist Area and Corridor Signage Program
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 11:16 AM
Click to return on the top page