Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
Sponsored by
Allegany County Delegation and Garrett County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing, in Allegany County and Garrett County, gift basket permits; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany County to issue a gift basket permit to certain persons; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Garrett County to issue a gift basket permit to certain persons; prohibiting each of the Boards from issuing the permit for certain uses; providing that the permit authorizes a permit holder to sell and deliver gift baskets containing beer, wine, or liquor to certain individuals; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0731
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/12/2021 3/04/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Text - Chapter - Allegany and Garrett Counties - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permits
(   21-1001.2, 21-102,   9-1001.2, 9-102   )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page