Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Bagnall, Bhandari, Carr, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kelly, Kerr, Kipke, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to coordinate the accessibility of electronic advance care planning documents in the State; requiring certain health care facilities, managed care organizations, and carriers to take certain actions relating to electronic advance care planning documents; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to submit a report regarding the implementation of certain provisions of law relating to advance directives; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0824
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {323121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {753824/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {323121/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Floor Amendment {753824/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Text - Chapter - Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page