Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Charkoudian, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, J. Long, Ruth, and Stewart
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing certain persons standing in environmental and natural resources protection proceedings; authorizing persons that meet standing requirements to bring certain civil actions under certain circumstances; requiring a plaintiff, under certain circumstances, to give certain notice and provide certain documentation to the Department of the Environment and the Attorney General and to file a certain affidavit; authorizing a court to grant certain relief, award certain costs, and impose certain civil penalties; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0653
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {763125/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/08/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-38)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573526/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-13)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-35)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments {763125/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/08/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
House 3/18/2024 3/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (100-38) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Favorable with Amendments {573526/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-13) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (98-35) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Standing - Environmental and Natural Resources Protection Proceedings (Clean Water Justice Act of 2024)
(   1-901 through 1-905 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 8:48 AM
Click to return on the top page