Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Contractors and Subcontractors - License Suspension and Permits
Sponsored by
Delegates Reilly, Hornberger, and McComas
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Home Improvement Commission to suspend the license of a certain licensee if the licensee is found liable for failing to pay a subcontractor, subject to certain hearing provisions; requiring the license of a certain licensee to remain suspended until the licensee pays a certain amount of a judgment; prohibiting a licensed contractor from surrendering a certain license or allowing a certain license to lapse while the licensee is under a certain suspension except under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Contractors and Subcontractors - License Suspension and Permits
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   8-301, 8-311, 8-311.1, 8-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page