Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Frederick
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr and Simpson
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the City of Frederick to participate in the Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Frederick
House 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Frederick
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2024 3/22/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 9:11 AM
Click to return on the top page