Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19
Sponsored by
Delegate Beitzel
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Secretary of Labor to waive the charging of unemployment insurance benefits paid to a claimant against the earned rating record of an employing unit during a state of emergency declared by the Governor due to COVID-19 under certain circumstances; providing that the required waiver of benefit charges is in effect only until the earlier of 4 months after a certain state of emergency has ended or the date the employing unit hires a certain workforce; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/18/2021 2/18/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   8-610, 8-611 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:22 PM
Click to return on the top page