Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Assault Forensic Examinations Conducted Through Telehealth - Reimbursement and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Bartlett, Arikan, Grammer, Conaway, Kaufman, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the reimbursement of a sexual assault forensic exam conducted through peer-to-peer telehealth under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Sexual Assault Evidence Kit Policy and Funding Committee to conduct a study on the feasibility of a telehealth program that includes a pilot program for conducting sexual assault forensic examinations through telehealth; and requiring the Committee to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2024.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0950
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343120/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sexual Assault Forensic Examinations Conducted Through Telehealth - Reimbursement and Study
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {343120/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Sexual Assault Forensic Examinations Conducted Through Telehealth - Reimbursement and Study
House 3/08/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Finance 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2024 3/14/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:24 PM
Click to return on the top page