Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Garrett County Delegation and Allegany County Delegation
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Virtual Education Days Pilot Program in Garrett County and Allegany County; authorizing the Garrett County Superintendent and the Allegany County Superintendent to order a virtual education day instead of closing a public school in the event of inclement weather; requiring a principal to notify students, parents, and school staff of a decision to have a virtual education day; requiring that accommodations be made for students and staff who do not have access to the Internet; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0848
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Garrett County and Allegany County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
(   7-103.2 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page