Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Water Pollution Control – Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution (Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Ivey, Allen, Boyce, Foley, Guyton, Healey, Lehman, J. Long, Ruth, Stein, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to identify significant industrial users that currently and intentionally use PFAS chemicals by October 1, 2024; requiring the Department to develop certain PFAS monitoring and testing criteria for certain significant industrial users by January 1, 2025; requiring the Department by June 1, 2025, to develop PFAS action levels for addressing PFAS contamination from industrial discharge for pretreatment permits; requiring the Department to develop mitigation plans by September 1, 2025; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0956
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {703821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {933725/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-30)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment – Water Pollution Control – Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution (Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution Act)
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments {853520/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2024 3/01/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – Water Pollution Control – Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution (Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution Act)
House 3/13/2024 3/02/2024 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments {703821/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Floor Amendment {933725/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2024 3/16/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 House Concurs Senate Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (106-30) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/19/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment – Water Pollution Control – Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution (Protecting State Waters From PFAS Pollution Act)
(   9-101,   9-353, 9-354 )
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 10:19 AM
Click to return on the top page