Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Queen, W. Fisher, Patterson, Proctor, and Turner
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing from 1,380 to 1,200 the number of hours of training in a cosmetology school that a certain applicant for a cosmetology license must complete before the applicant may take a certain written examination; requiring cosmetology schools to administer a certain part of an examination to certain students; and requiring the State Board of Cosmetologists to adopt regulations to require cosmetology schools to administer a certain part of an examination and to provide the opportunity for certain remedial training to certain students.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0564
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1785 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Cosmetologist - Licensing Examination - Requirements
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page