Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Sponsored by
Delegate Bridges
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities; requiring the Commission's membership to reflect the diversity of the State to the extent practicable; requiring the Commission to meet at least six times a year; requiring the Commission to host at least four community listening sessions a year; requiring the Commission to conduct its meetings and sessions in different geographic locations in the State; requiring the sessions and meetings of the Commission to be accessible to all attendees; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0674
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {800414/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-14)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834833/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-35)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {800414/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
House 3/22/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (121-14) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/03/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments {834833/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-35) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Text - Chapter - Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page