Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Income Tax Credit for Parent and Guardian Volunteers in Elementary and Secondary Schools PG 411-24
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing certain eligible taxpayers who volunteer in certain schools in Prince George's County a credit against the State income tax in an amount equal to $20 for each volunteer hour, not to exceed $500; requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with the Comptroller, to develop and make available a certain application and tax credit certificate; requiring a certain county board member or school administrator to issue tax credit certificates in a certain manner; making the credit refundable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Prince George's County - Income Tax Credit for Parent and Guardian Volunteers in Elementary and Secondary Schools PG 411-24
House 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 3/06/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   10-758 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:24 PM
Click to return on the top page