Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Sponsored by
Delegates Henson, Atterbeary, C. Branch, Charles, Ebersole, Feldmark, Griffith, Ivey, D. Jones, Lisanti, Luedtke, Patterson, and Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation to provide a certain bonus to certain public school employees in fiscal year 2024; and requiring the State Department of Education to collect data from each county board of education and Baltimore City on the number of noncertificated education support professionals employed during the 2021-2022 school year and to submit a report on the data by September 15, 2022, to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education Support Professionals - Workgroup and Bonus
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693428/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-34)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education Support Professionals - Workgroup and Bonus
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Reassigned to Ways and Means Appropriations 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693428/1 Adopted 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
House 3/30/2022 3/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-34) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Referred Rules 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/06/2022 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Text - Chapter - Education Support Professionals - Bonus and Report
Statutes
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:05 PM
Click to return on the top page