Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
Sponsored by
Delegate Howard
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; providing that the purpose of the Fund is to support the Maryland Department of Health in studying the effectiveness of and improving access to alternative therapies for post-traumatic stress disorder in veterans; and requiring the Governor to include, for fiscal year 2024, in the annual budget bill an appropriation in the amount of $1,000,000 to the Fund.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0709
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate P. Young) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {223629/1 (Delegate P. Young) Adopted
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment
House 2/18/2022 2/18/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate P. Young) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Floor Amendment {223629/1 (Delegate P. Young) Adopted 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder and Traumatic Brain Injury Alternative Therapies Fund - Establishment (David Perez Military Heroes Act (End 22 a Day))
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules 72 Click to view Recorded Media
(   24-1801, 24-1802 )
Last Updated: 4/15/2022 11:42 AM
Click to return on the top page