Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Infrastructure Grants - Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit - Established
Sponsored by
Delegate R. Lewis
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit in the Governor's Grants Office for the purpose of tracking federal infrastructure grants and assisting State agencies in the award of the grants under the federal Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act of 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0755
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Infrastructure Grants - Federal Infrastructure Investment and Coordination Unit - Established
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page