Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Edelson, R. Lewis, R. Long, and Metzgar
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor and the Department of Commerce to establish certain temporary relief programs to provide assistance to individuals and certain entities impacted by a certain closure of the Port of Baltimore; and authorizing the Governor to transfer by budget amendment funds from the Revenue Stabilization Account to fund the temporary relief programs.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1188
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (140-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283521/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {783524/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (39-95)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {293128/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (39-97)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-2)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/30/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2024
Legislative Date
4/09/2024
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (140-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Rereferred to Economic Matters and Appropriations
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments {283521/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Floor Amendment {783524/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (39-95) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Floor Amendment {293128/1 (Delegate Chisholm) Rejected (39-97) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (129-2) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Hettleman) Adopted 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Rereferred to Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Favorable Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Second Reading Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/30/2024 Returned Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2024 4/09/2024 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2
Text - Chapter - Maryland Protecting Opportunities and Regional Trade (PORT) Act
(   18-4001 through 18-4004 )
Last Updated: 4/17/2024 9:44 AM
Click to return on the top page