Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17
Sponsored by
Prince George's County Delegation
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing the fee for a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license in Prince George's County from $2,305 to $3,025; exempting specified applicants for a Class BH license from specified application requirements for sole proprietorships and partnerships in Prince George's County; and prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County from making available for issuance at a hearing less than a specified number of licenses.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses PG 307-17
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   26-102, 26-1405, 26-1511, 26-902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page