Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the court to admit into evidence in certain criminal proceedings certain out of court statements made by a child victim or witness who is under the age of 13 years and an alleged victim or a witness in a case concerning a crime of violence, subject to certain requirements.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0284
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/15/2021
Legislative Date
10/15/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child Victims
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {813422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/21/2022
Legislative Date
4/21/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/15/2021 10/15/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Out of Court Statements – Child Victims
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments {813422/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/22/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Senate 2/24/2022 2/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Referred Judiciary 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {563523/1 Adopted 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Post Passage 4/21/2022 4/21/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Text - Chapter - Criminal Procedure - Out of Court Statements - Child Victims and Witnesses
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page