Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that an individual who has been convicted of a crime punishable by imprisonment exceeding 1 year and is currently serving the sentence imposed for the conviction, including a term of parole or probation, or a crime involving or relating to witness or jury intimidation is not qualified for jury service.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0074
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0625 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783922/1
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
23AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {253128/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {253128/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {833829/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/16/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Senate 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783922/1 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Ready) Adopted 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {783922/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/11/2022 Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2022 2/11/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/15 (Senator Smith) Adopted 23AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Floor Amendment {933527/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Floor Amendment {253128/1 (Senator Ready) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2022 2/13/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Senator Ready) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Floor Amendment {253128/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Floor Amendment {833829/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2022 2/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Senate 2/21/2022 2/16/2022 Third Reading Passed (31-15) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Referred Judiciary 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/24/2022 10:11 AM
Click to return on the top page