Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0030 - Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification

Judicial Proceedings 1/26/2022 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/23/2022 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/5/2022 6:25:31 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Carter, Jill FAV Oral Testimony
Testimony_JPC_SB0030_LR1151.pdf
JPR
Giannetti , John MCDAA - Maryland Criminal Defense Attorneys' Association FAV Oral Testimony
Combined Support Doc and National Chart for JPR .p
JPR
riley, joseph Maryland State's Attorneys Association UNF Oral Testimony
SB 30 - UNFAV - OPP.pdf
JPR
Jarashow, Ronald Maryland Association for Justice FAV Oral Testimony
MAJ Position Paper SB30 jury elibility f.pdf
JPR
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2022-01-26 SB 30 (Support).pdf JPR
Haven, Kimberly FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Breen, John Maryland Association for Justice FAV Oral Testimony
MAJ Position Paper SB30 jury elibility f.pdf
JPR
Hilliard, Elizabeth Maryland Office of the Public Defender FAV Oral Testimony
OPD Statement_Support_Sb30_Jury Service Disqualifi
JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 1-25-2022 at 938 AM JPR
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2022-03-23 SB 30 (Cross-over Support).pdf JUD
Hilliard, Elizabeth Maryland Office of the Public Defender FAV Oral Testimony
SB 0030 MOPD Favorablte Statement.pdf
JUD
Williams, Krystal MARYLAND OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER FAV OPD Favorable Statement_SB30-Jury Service Disquali JUD
Click to return on the top page