Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that teachers employed by the Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0137
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0021 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/30/2018
Legislative Date
7/30/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-0)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/30/2018 7/30/2018 Pre-filed
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Senate 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Second Reading Passed 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Referred Appropriations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (129-0) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
(   8-3A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page