Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Reasonable Suspicion and Probable Cause - Cannabis
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Providing that, with a certain exception, a finding or determination of reasonable suspicion or probable cause relating to possession of contraband or other criminal activity may not be based solely on evidence of the odor of certain cannabis, the possession of or suspicion of possession of cannabis, or the presence of money in proximity to cannabis; and providing that evidence obtained in violation of the Act is not admissible in certain proceedings.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/20/2022
Legislative Date
11/20/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/20/2022 11/20/2022 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Reasonable Suspicion and Probable Cause - Cannabis
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/31/2023 4:43 PM
Click to return on the top page