Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Human Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that the Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program include documentation of a noncustodial parent's compliance status at 14 days after the effective date of a certain consent agreement; and altering certain Program evaluation reporting requirements.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/27/2017
Legislative Date
9/27/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2018
Legislative Date
1/04/2018
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2018
Legislative Date
1/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/27/2017 9/27/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Senate 1/04/2018 1/04/2018 Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Favorable Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/26/2018 1/26/2018 Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Referred Judiciary 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text - Chapter - Child Support - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program - Documentation and Reporting
(   10-112.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page