Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Sponsored by
Senator A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing and establishing the methodology used to calculate the weekly benefit amount; altering the taxable wage base used to determine employer contributions to the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund, the dependent allowance, and the amount of earned wages subtracted from a weekly benefit amount; requiring the Secretary of Labor to set the taxable wage base and the maximum weekly benefit amount in a certain manner beginning in calendar year 2027 and each calendar year thereafter; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0205
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2025, July 1, 2026
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance Modernization Act of 2024
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page