Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth, Bailey, Beidle, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Griffith, Hershey, Hester, Jackson, Jennings, Klausmeier, Lee, Ready, Waldstreicher, West, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting a vehicle owned by a member of the military on active duty or who returns to the State from active duty from the vehicle excise tax under certain circumstances.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0497
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/23/2021
Legislative Date
7/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {863524/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/23/2021 7/23/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/01/2022 2/01/2022 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Floor Amendment {863524/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 17 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Referred Ways and Means 11 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:47 PM
Click to return on the top page