Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who tortiously causes an injury to or death of a pet while acting through an animal under the person's ownership is liable to the owner of the pet for specified compensatory damages; increasing from $7500 to a maximum of $10,000 the cap on the compensatory damages for which a person who tortiously causes an injury to or death of a pet is liable; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2017
Legislative Date
1/16/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {432911/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Dumais) Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2017 1/16/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Senate 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {432911/1 Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Dumais) Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413
Text - Chapter - Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page