Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Conditional and Temporary Licenses to Practice Social Work
Sponsored by
Senators West and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Social Work Examiners to issue a conditional license to practice social work to an applicant who, except for passing a required examination, has met the appropriate education and experience requirements for a certain license if the required examination was unavailable to the applicant for a period of at least 15 business days; authorizing the Board to issue a temporary license to practice social work to certain applicants who have met certain requirements for certain licenses; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0103
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0173 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293327/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Temporary License to Practice Social Work
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Favorable with Amendments {293327/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Conditional and Temporary Licenses to Practice Social Work
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 10:49 AM
Click to return on the top page