Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Entering into the Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact; establishing criteria for participating states; authorizing an advanced practice registered nurse to practice in a party state under certain scope of practice rules; establishing the Interstate Commission of APRN Compact Administrators and its duties and powers; providing for the amendment of and withdrawal from the Compact; and providing the Compact is contingent on the enacting of substantially similar legislation in six other states.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Contingency - on adoption of an interstate compact
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/17/2021
Legislative Date
8/17/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/17/2021 8/17/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/13/2022 6:41 PM
Click to return on the top page