Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Aviation Commission - Duties, Composition, and Member Orientation
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Beidle, Elfreth, Guzzone, and Gile
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Aviation Commission to establish policies, based on accepted scientific research on creating and maintaining healthy and livable communities, to best mitigate actual and potential negative impacts of the local aviation and airport industries; requiring the Commission to consider information and advice from certain additional stakeholders; requiring that certain members of the Commission appointed by the Governor are to be selected from candidates recommended by certain county Senate delegations; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0204
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2023
Legislative Date
1/18/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2023
Legislative Date
1/21/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {613529/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2023
Legislative Date
3/26/2023
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2023 1/18/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Aviation Commission - Duties, Composition, and Member Orientation
Senate 1/21/2023 1/21/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments {613529/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Lam) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Favorable with Amendments {453420/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/11/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Aviation Commission - Duties, Composition, and Member Orientation
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Appropriations 50AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2023 3/26/2023 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 4:07 PM
Click to return on the top page