Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes, Beidle, Benson, Ellis, Feldman, Kramer, Lee, Sydnor, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, Augustine, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Griffith, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, McCray, Peters, Rosapepe, Salling, and Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Pathways to Health Equity Program in the Community Health Resources Commission to provide the foundation and guidance for a permanent Health Equity Resource Community program; requiring the Program to provide grant funding to reduce health disparities, improve health outcomes, improve access to primary care, promote primary and secondary prevention services, and reduce health care costs; requiring the Commission to establish Health Equity Resource Communities to target State resources to certain areas for certain purposes; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0463
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2021
Legislative Date
1/11/2021
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379935/1
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {379935/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Senate 1/11/2021 1/11/2021 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {379935/1 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/25/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable with Amendments {379935/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 741
Text - Chapter - Maryland Health Equity Resource Act
(   20-1401 through 20-1408 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page