Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Diagnostic and Supplemental Examinations for Breast Cancer - Cost-Sharing
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Benson, Gile, Hester, and King
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide coverage for diagnostic and supplemental breast examinations from imposing a copayment, coinsurance, or deductible requirement for the examination; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0376
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2023
Legislative Date
1/21/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2023
Legislative Date
3/03/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/04/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Diagnostic and Supplemental Examinations for Breast Cancer - Cost-Sharing
Senate 1/21/2023 1/21/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Favorable with Amendments {893727/1 Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2023 3/03/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Diagnostic and Supplemental Examinations for Breast Cancer - Cost-Sharing
Senate 3/13/2023 3/04/2023 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-814.1 )
Last Updated: 3/16/2023 8:59 AM
Click to return on the top page