Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Capital Debt Affordability Committee include certain debt that is secured by future federal aid within its review of State tax supported debt; altering the calculation of the maximum amount of debt secured by future federal aid that the Department of Transportation may issue; increasing, from 12 years to 15 years, the maximum term of certain bonds; repealing the pledge of certain taxes to the payment of certain bonds secured by a pledge of future federal aid; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/30/2021
Legislative Date
9/30/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/30/2021 9/30/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Department of Transportation – Grant Anticipation Revenue Vehicle Bonds
Senate 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page