Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor)
Status
In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from requiring a borrower to pay a fee for a payment made by or on behalf of the borrow in a certain form including an electronic funds transfer through an Automated Clearing House; and authorizing a person to require a borrower to pay a fee for the transaction of a payment made by or on behalf of the borrower in cases of certain loans made to consumer borrowers if the amount of the fee is disclosed at the time of the payment transaction, the borrower agrees to pay the fee, and the fee does not exceed a certain amount.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2023
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2022
Legislative Date
1/08/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
Senate 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Fees
Senate 1/08/2022 1/08/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {203321/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Loans - Payments and Fees
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hettleman) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Economic Matters 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments {853022/1 Adopted 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 67 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Senate Requests House Recede 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 House Refuses Recede 57 Click to view Recorded Media
(   12-1005.1, 12-108.1, 12-307.2, 12-405.1, 12-905.1 )
Last Updated: 4/26/2022 12:10 PM
Click to return on the top page