Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Lam, Hettleman, Jackson, Lee, Smith, Sydnor, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an officer, an employee, an agent, or a contractor of the State or a political subdivision to deny inspection by a federal agency seeking access for certain immigration enforcement matters of the part of a public record that contains personal information or a certain photographic image unless a warrant is provided; requiring law enforcement agencies operating certain databases to require certain individuals accessing the databases to provide certain information; requiring a certain annual report to the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0023
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748276/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {748276/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Personal Information - State and Local Agencies - Restrictions on Access (Maryland Driver Privacy Act)
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page