Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Out–of–State Taxes Paid by Pass–Through Entities – Addition Modification
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (By Request - Office of the Comptroller)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022, an addition modification under the Maryland income tax for the amount of a certain tax credit claimed for certain taxes paid to another state by a member of a pass-through entity under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2023
Legislative Date
1/24/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2023
Legislative Date
1/26/2023
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2023 1/24/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Out–of–State Taxes Paid by Pass–Through Entities – Addition Modification
Senate 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/26/2023 1/26/2023 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/16/2023 7:29 PM
Click to return on the top page