Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $1,000,000 for fiscal year 2023 for the Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program Fund to be used for certain loans under the Nonprofit, Interest-Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account; and requiring the Governor to include an appropriation of $1,000,000 in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2024 if the $1,000,000 is not included in the fiscal year 2023 budget bill.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0256
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0376 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {343022/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Senate 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {343022/1 Adopted 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Referred Ways and Means 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:51 PM
Click to return on the top page