Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Sponsored by
Cecil County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Cecil County, for the purpose of providing Internet service, to exercise certain authority in the entirety of the unincorporated area of the county, establish a special taxing district if property owners in the proposed district petition the county in a certain manner, impose ad valorem or special taxes, and issue bonds in accordance with certain provisions of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0997
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Special Taxing Districts - Broadband Internet Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {389739/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-8)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 Hearing 2/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Text - First - Cecil County - Special Taxing Districts - Broadband Internet Service
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {389739/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Referred Ways and Means 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (125-8) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 710
Text - Chapter - Cecil County – Special Taxing Districts – Internet Service
(   21-503, 21-520 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page