Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Student Bus Transportation Expenses
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a refundable credit against the State income tax for certain student bus transportation expenses paid by an individual resident who is the parent or guardian of the student during the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2022.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0486
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2023
Legislative Date
1/27/2023
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Student Bus Transportation Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2023
Legislative Date
1/30/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2023 1/27/2023 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Student Bus Transportation Expenses
Senate 1/30/2023 1/30/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-757 )
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 6:09 PM
Click to return on the top page