Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and Models
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting, under specified circumstances, a health care practitioner who has a specified compensation arrangement with a health care entity from a provision of law that prohibits a health care practitioner from referring a patient or directing specified persons to refer a patient to a specified health care entity; providing that the exemption is null and void if the Maryland Insurance Commissioner issues a specified order; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0403
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and Models
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments {157077/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and Models
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Text - Chapter - Maryland Patient Referral Law - Compensation Arrangements Under Federally Approved Programs and Models
(   15-143, 2-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page