Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Office of the Attorney General) and Senator Lee
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of "firearm" to include a certain unfinished frame or receiver; prohibiting a person from purchasing, receiving, selling, offering to sell, or transferring an unfinished frame or receiver; prohibiting a person from selling, offering to sell, or transferring a certain firearm; prohibiting a person from possessing a firearm on or after March 1, 2023, unless it is required by federal law to be, and has been, imprinted with a certain number in a certain manner; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393025/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {213422/1 (Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-41)
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable with Amendments {393025/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Smith) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Smith) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {213422/1 (Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 44AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Judiciary 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/25/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2022 3/19/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Third Reading Passed (92-41) 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
(   5-101,   5-114,   5-701 through 5-705 )
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:36 PM
Click to return on the top page