Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0387 - Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms

Judicial Proceedings 2/16/2022 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/23/2022 1:00:00 PM
As of: 8/18/2022 1:38:07 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
President, President FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Brown, Anthony G. House of Representatives FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Spiker, D.J. National Rifle Association UNF Oral Testimony JPR
Conway, Mark FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Benjamin, Peter Marylanders to Prevent Gun Violence FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Lowe, Mary Pat Moms Demand Action FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Yontef-McGrath, Amy Maryland Moms Demand Action and Students Demand Action FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Morris, Laura Moms Demand Action FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Fry, Donald Greater Baltimore Committee FAV SB0387 - 2.16.22 -- Public Safety - Untraceable Fi JPR
Lieberman, Jim CIF FAV SB 387 ghost gun testimony 2-15- 22 ..pdf JPR
Veith, Danielle Maryland Moms Demand Action FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Elrich, Marc Montgomery County Government FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Herren, Karen FAV Oral Testimony
(Final)Ghost Guns 2022 SB387.pdf
JPR
Hollywood, Nicole FAV Oral Testimony
2.16 MD Mom Testimony.pdf
JPR
Pennak, Mark Maryland Shall Issue, Inc. UNF Oral Testimony
MSI Testimony on HB 425 and SB 387 Final.final.pdf
JPR
Boston, Frank UNF Oral Testimony JPR
Reid, Denise Moms Demand Action FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Bledsoe, Janice Baltimore City State's Attorney Office FWA Oral Testimony JPR
Morningstar, Sara Montgomery County Government FAV SB 387 - MoCo_Morningstar_FAV (GA 22).pdf JPR
Munson II, Jon UNF SB_327_JonCMunsonII_UNFAVORABLE.pdf JPR
Egan, Ashley UULM-MD FAV SB 387 -Support-UULM-MD Jan Bird, MD.docx - Google JPR
Pica, John Pica & Associates, LLC UNF NSFF SB 387 - Untraceable Firearms - Oppose.pdf JPR
Frey, Leslie Montgomery County FAV VSAB Support Ltr Ghost Guns Senate 2022.pdf JPR
Frosh, Brian Office of the Attorney General FAV Oral Testimony
2022-02-16 SB 387 (Support).pdf
JPR
Bartlett, Olivia DoTheMostGood FAV SB0387-FAV-DTMG-2-16-22.pdf JPR
Gibson, Rich Howard County State's Attorney's Office FWA SB 0387_Howard Co State's Attorney_FWA 2.14.22.pdf JPR
Paylor, Perry State's Attorney's Office for Prince George's County FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Toscano, Christopher UNF TOSCANO_ Written Testimony on SB0387 Untaceable Fi JPR
Mooney, Karla TWAW / DC Project / MSI UNF Oral Testimony
Testimony SB 0387_HB 0425 Untraceable Firearms.pd
JPR
Schardt , Tanya Brady FAV Brady.SB387.Support.pdf JPR
Dummitt, Ashley UNF Oral Testimony
HB425_SB387 Testimony.pdf
JPR
Josselyn, John 2A Maryland UNF Oral Testimony
SB0387_Testimony_Unfavorable_2-16-22.pdf
JPR
Worley , Richard Baltimore Police Department FAV Oral Testimony
SB 387 BPD Support.pdf
JPR
Hodge, Daryl UNF Oral Testimony
Ghost Gun Testimony.pdf
JPR
Hall, Dillon UNF SB387_HB425 DH Testimony.pdf JPR
Kasuba, Thomas UNF Oral Testimony
Kasuba_OPPOSE_SB0387.pdf
Kasuba2_OPPOSE_SB0387.pdf
JPR
Novotny, Katie UNF Oral Testimony
Katie_Novotny_UNF_SB387.pdf
JPR
Stramella, Scott UNF SB387 Opposition.pdf JPR
Kasemeyer, Pam FAV SB0387_FAV_City of Rockville_Public Safety - Untra JPR
Krone, Christine FAV No Testimony JPR
Levy, Samuel Everytown for Gun Safety FAV MD SB 387 Testimony.pdf JPR
McGuire, James UNF Oral Testimony
mcguire_opposed_sb-0387.pdf
JPR
Sugar, Earle UNF SB0387_Earle Sugar_UNF.pdf JPR
Beller, Joel Baltimore County Government FAV BaltimoreCounty_FAV_SB0387.pdf JPR
Cockrum, Chris Accuforge UNF SB0387_Testimony_Accuforge_20220215.pdf JPR
Bailey, Michael UNF No Testimony JPR
Ali, Saqib FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Kraska, MJ Maryland Catholic Conference FAV MD Catholic Conference_FAV_SB0387.pdf JPR
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony JPR
Hewitt, Scott UNF grassley_to_justice_dept.guncrimeinitiative.pdf
Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee, Testimony i
JPR
Aziz, Malik Chief of Prince George's County Police Department FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Harman, David UNF Letter written in Opposition to Senate Bill 387.pd JPR
McCarthy, John Montgomery County State's Attorney's Office FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Amsbaugh, Brent UNF SB0387 Testimony.pdf JPR
Barbieri, Nicholas UNF No Testimony JPR
Balazek, John Self UNF Oral Testimony JPR
Gentry, Patrick UNF Oral Testimony
As a gun owner, I enjoy the building and engineeri
JPR
Doherty, Mike Maryland State Rifle & Pistol Association UNF MSRPA Opposes SB387-2022.pdf JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0387_Untraceable_Firearms_MLC_FAV.pdf JPR
Grose, James UNF Oral Testimony JPR
Goode, Willow The League of Women Voters Maryland FAV SB387-Public Safety-Untraceable Firearms .pdf JPR
Davis, Scott UNF WRITTEN TESTIMONY SCOTT GREGORY DAVIS UNFAVORABLE JPR
McCann Jr, William B UNF SB 387 McCann Unfav.pdf JPR
Adamson, Jeff UNF Adamson SB387Testimony.pdf JPR
Davis, Sherrie-Lynn UNF Written testimony of Sherrie-Lynn H Davis unfavora JPR
Caine, Brian UNF SB0387_Brian_Caine_unf.pdf JPR
Dubovsky, Stephen UNF No Testimony JPR
Upman, Patrick UNF SB387.pdf JPR
Johnston, Stephen UNF SB387 UNFAVORABLE - Stephen Johnston.pdf JPR
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0387-JPR-FAV.pdf JPR
Brown, Michael UNF SB0387_brownmj_unf.pdf JPR
Scott, Brandon Mayor, Baltimore City Administration FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Ceresi, Austin UNF SB0387 Testimony.pdf JPR
Andraka, Nicholas UNF Oral Testimony
Senate Bill 387.pdf
JPR
Menendez, Daniel UNF RE_ HB425_SB387 (4).pdf JPR
Novotny, Art UNF Art_Novotny_UNF_SB387.pdf JPR
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FAV Oral Testimony
SB 387_MNADV_FAV.pdf
JPR
Carlin-Weber, Daniel UNF Oral Testimony
DC-W_SB387_UNF.pdf
JPR
Kryger, William UNF SB0387 Unfavorable Position.pdf JPR
Gross, Kenneth UNF SB387 Testimony 2022.pdf JPR
DeTello, Nicholas UNF Oral Testimony
SB387_Nicholas_DeTello.pdf
JPR
BAILEY, JOSHUA UNF Oral Testimony
Letter to MD Senate.pdf
JPR
Burke, Michael Maryland Shall Issue UNF Oral Testimony
MFB - Testimony on HB 485 and SB 387.pdf
JPR
Apple, Chris FAV Oral Testimony
SB0387_Chris_Apple_FAV.pdf
JPR
Peterson, Matt FAV SB 387 - Ghost Guns.pdf JPR
Hinkle, Russell UNF RJH SB387 UNF.pdf JPR
GUNDLING, JOHN UNF MD Senate JPC Opposing Testimony SB387.pdf JPR
Fedorko, Joel UNF sb387.pdf JPR
Yiannakis, Christin UNF No Testimony JPR
Hayes, Justin Comptroller of Maryland FAV 2-16-2022 - SB387 - Public Safety - Untraceable Fi JPR
Dolan, John UNF SB387_JohnDolan_unf.pdf JPR
Sanchez, Osiris UNF SB0387_Osiris Sanchez_UNF.pdf JPR
Love, William UNF No Testimony JPR
Kohler, Gene UNF SB 387 Gene Kohler.pdf JPR
Sharpless, Bradford UNF SB 387, Untraceable Firearms, 2022, Sharpless.pdf JPR
Phelps, Ken Maryland Episcopal Public Policy Network FAV 2022 SB 0387 - FAVORABLE.pdf JPR
Lipko, Seth UNF No Testimony JPR
Cyphers, Moira Compass Government Relations FAV Oral Testimony
Giffords Testimony in Support of SB 387.pdf
JPR
Collins, Michael Baltimore City State's Attorney's Office FWA SB387 Amedment.BCSAO.pdf JPR
McAdam, Hunter UNF _SB387_htm_unf.pdf JPR
DeTello, Jessica UNF SB387_Jessica_DeTello.pdf JPR
Koravos, JoAnne Montgomery County Women's Democratic Club FAV WDC Testimony SB0387_2022.pdf JPR
Wojtysiak, Theodore UNF SB387.pdf JPR
DeTello, Lydia UNF Oral Testimony
SB387_Lydia_DeTello.pdf
JPR
Adams, William UNF Oppose SB0387.pdf JPR
Williams, Krystal MARYLAND OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER UNF No Testimony JPR
Lee, Susan FAV Oral Testimony
SB387_FAV_Lee_2022.pdf
JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-16-2022 at 1006 AM JPR
President, President FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Beller, Joel Baltimore County Government FAV BaltimoreCounty_FAV_SB0387.pdf JUD
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV sb387, ghost guns, 2022.pdf JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0387_Untraceable_Firearms_MLC_FAV.pdf JUD
Frosh, Brian Office of the Attorney General FAV 2022-03-23 SB 387 (Cross-over Support).pdf JUD
Kraska, MJ Maryland Catholic Conference FAV MD Catholic Conference_FAV_SB0387.pdf JUD
Phelps, Ken Maryland Episcopal Public Policy Network FAV 2022 SB 0387 - FAVORABLE.pdf JUD
Bartlett, Olivia DoTheMostGood FAV SB0387-FAV-DTMG-3-23-22.pdf JUD
Carrington, Darrell Carrington & Associates, LLC FAV Carrington 2022 PGC - SB 387 - Public Safety - Unt JUD
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FAV SB 387_MNADV_FAV_JUD.pdf JUD
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0387-JUD-FAV.pdf JUD
Egan, Ashley UULM-MD FAV SB 387 -Support-UULM-MD Jan Bird, MD jud.docx - Go JUD
Frosh, Brian Attorney General of Maryland FAV No Testimony JUD
Click to return on the top page