Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing, in Harford County, a gift basket permit; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the permit to a person whose business includes the sale and delivery of gift baskets; providing that a permit holder is subject to certain alcohol awareness training requirements; limiting the total annual sales from alcoholic beverages to 10% of the annual gross sales of the permit holder; establishing a permit fee of $100; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1100
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554932/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {554932/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 540
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Age
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:16 PM
Click to return on the top page