Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the period of time that certain individuals who are at least a certain age and who hold a learner's instructional permit are required to wait before taking certain examinations for a provisional driver's license.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0394
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text - Chapter - Driver’s Licenses – Learner’s Permits – Minimum Duration
(   16-105, 16-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page