Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Sponsored by
Senator A. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a local delivery service permit that authorizes the holder to deliver alcoholic beverages from a certain retail license holder that is authorized to deliver alcoholic beverages to purchasers in a certain jurisdiction under certain circumstances; authorizing certain retail license holders to deliver alcoholic beverages to purchasers in a certain jurisdiction through a third-party contractor, an independent contractor, or an agent that holds a certain delivery service permit under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0808
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0815 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
4/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373527/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/06/2024
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {163925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 4/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {373527/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/06/2024 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {163925/1 Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/26/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages – Retail Delivery – Local Delivery Service Permit
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:21 PM
Click to return on the top page